Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/24/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 04/24/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 05/14/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 05/14/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 05/16/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 09/30/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 10/23/2013