Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/07/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 05/08/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 07/09/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 07/22/2013