Refine your search

23 results for All Actions
Date Chamber All Actions
10/31/2013 Senate Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: Senate
10/30/2013-2:28pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
10/30/2013-2:28pm House On passage Passed by recorded vote: 292 - 122 (Roll no. 569). (text: CR H6916)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
10/30/2013-2:21pm House On motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 190 - 223 (Roll no. 568).
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
10/30/2013-1:56pm House The previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection. (consideration: CR H6926)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
10/30/2013-1:49pm House Floor summary: DEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Brownley motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to prohibit any restriction on the ability of financial regulators to ensure that financial institutions comply with laws prohibiting the manipulation of commodity markets, especially with regard to speculation in oil and biofuel contracts.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
10/30/2013-1:49pm House Ms. Brownley (CA) moved to recommit with instructions to Financial Services. (consideration: CR H6925-6927; text: CR H6925)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
10/30/2013-1:48pm House The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H6925)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
10/30/2013-12:40pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 992.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
10/30/2013-12:40pm House Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 391. (consideration: CR H6916-6928)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/25/2013 House Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 169.
Type of Action: Calendars
Action By: House of Representatives
09/25/2013 House Reported by the Committee on Agriculture. H. Rept. 113-229, Part II.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Agriculture
09/25/2013 House Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 113-229, Part I.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Financial Services
05/07/2013 House Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 53 - 6.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Financial Services
05/07/2013 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Financial Services
04/11/2013 House Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Capital Markets and Government Sponsored Enterprises Prior to Referral.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Financial Services Subcommittee on Capital Markets and Government Sponsored Enterprises
03/20/2013 House Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 31 - 14.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Agriculture
03/20/2013 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Agriculture
03/14/2013 House Committee Hearings Held.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Agriculture
03/06/2013 House Referred to House Agriculture
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives
03/06/2013 House Referred to House Financial Services
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives
03/06/2013 House Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives
03/06/2013 House Introduced in House
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives