Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 03/13/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 03/13/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 03/13/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 03/14/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 03/14/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/16/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/16/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 10/22/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/15/2014