Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 03/21/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13] 04/17/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/23/2014
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/23/2014
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 07/10/2014