Refine your search

Refined by:

Tennessee Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 02/27/2014
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 05/28/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/09/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/17/2014
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 06/24/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 09/15/2014