Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 03/06/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 03/06/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 03/06/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 03/06/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 03/12/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 03/21/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 03/21/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 03/21/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 04/10/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13] 04/17/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 04/25/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 05/22/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/22/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 07/09/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 07/31/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 08/02/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 09/09/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 09/09/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 09/27/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 10/07/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 10/09/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 11/19/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 11/19/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 12/02/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 01/07/2014
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 01/14/2014
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 02/27/2014
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/27/2014
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 02/27/2014
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/28/2014
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 04/28/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/06/2014
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 05/20/2014
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 05/21/2014
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/21/2014
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 05/28/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/09/2014
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/09/2014
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/10/2014
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45] 06/10/2014
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/10/2014
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 06/10/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 06/17/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/17/2014
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/18/2014
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/18/2014
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/23/2014
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/23/2014
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 06/24/2014
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 06/24/2014
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 06/24/2014
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/09/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/10/2014
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 07/10/2014
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 07/14/2014
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 07/15/2014
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 07/28/2014
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 07/31/2014
Rep. McAllister, Vance M. [R-LA-5] 09/08/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 09/09/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 09/15/2014
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 11/12/2014