Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 07/16/2014
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/17/2014
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 07/17/2014
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 07/17/2014
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 07/17/2014
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 07/17/2014
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 07/17/2014
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 07/17/2014
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 07/17/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 07/17/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/17/2014
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 07/17/2014
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 07/17/2014
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 07/17/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/18/2014
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 07/18/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 07/22/2014
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 07/22/2014
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/22/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 07/22/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/22/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 07/22/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 07/22/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 07/22/2014
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 07/22/2014
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/22/2014
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/23/2014
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 07/23/2014
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 07/23/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 07/23/2014
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 07/23/2014
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 07/23/2014
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 07/23/2014
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 07/23/2014
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 07/23/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 07/23/2014
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 07/23/2014
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/23/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 07/23/2014
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 07/23/2014
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 07/24/2014
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/24/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 07/24/2014
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 07/24/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 07/24/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/24/2014
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/24/2014
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/24/2014
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 07/24/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 07/24/2014
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 07/24/2014
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 07/24/2014
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 07/24/2014
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 07/24/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 07/24/2014
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 07/24/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/24/2014
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/25/2014
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/25/2014
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/25/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 07/25/2014
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/25/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 07/25/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 07/25/2014
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/29/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/29/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/29/2014
Rep. Clawson, Curt [R-FL-19] 07/29/2014
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/29/2014
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 07/29/2014
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 07/29/2014
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/29/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 07/29/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/29/2014
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 07/29/2014
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 07/29/2014
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 07/30/2014
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 07/30/2014
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 07/30/2014
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/30/2014
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 07/30/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 07/30/2014
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 07/30/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/30/2014
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 07/30/2014
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 07/30/2014
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 07/30/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/30/2014
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 07/30/2014
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 07/30/2014
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 07/30/2014
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 07/30/2014
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/30/2014
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 07/30/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 07/30/2014
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 07/30/2014
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 07/30/2014
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 07/30/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 07/30/2014
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/30/2014
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/30/2014
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/30/2014