There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of Congress regarding the conditions for the United States becoming a signatory to the United Nations Arms Trade Treaty, or to any similar agreement on the arms trade.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/13/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
03/13/2013Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/13/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (151)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 03/13/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 03/13/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 03/13/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 03/13/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2]* 03/13/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 03/13/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13]* 03/13/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 03/15/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 03/19/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 03/19/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 03/20/2013
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/21/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 03/25/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 03/25/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 04/09/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 04/10/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 04/10/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 04/10/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/10/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 04/11/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 04/12/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/15/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/16/2013
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 04/16/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/17/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 04/24/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/14/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 06/03/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 06/03/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 06/06/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/10/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 07/08/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 07/09/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 09/25/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 10/22/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 05/19/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs03/13/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Con.Res.23. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/13/2013)

Expresses the sense of Congress that: (1) the President should not sign the Arms Trade Treaty, and that, if he transmits the Treaty with his signature to the Senate, the Senate should not ratify it; and (2) until the Treaty has been signed by the President, received the advice and consent of the Senate, and has been the subject of implementing legislation by Congress, no federal funds should be appropriated or authorized to implement the Treaty, or any similar agreement, or to conduct activities relevant to the Treaty, or any similar agreement.