Refine your search

Refined by:

Illinois Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 03/20/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/11/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 06/14/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 06/26/2013