Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 03/19/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/11/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/11/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/11/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/11/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 04/23/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/07/2013
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 05/07/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/14/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/14/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/16/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/16/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/04/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/04/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 07/19/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/30/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/12/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/29/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 03/12/2014
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 03/24/2014
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 03/24/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 04/01/2014
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/09/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/28/2014
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 05/20/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 05/20/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/18/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/19/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/08/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 07/23/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/23/2014
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/25/2014
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 07/30/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 08/01/2014
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/09/2014