Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10]* 04/10/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 04/12/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/12/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 04/12/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 04/12/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/12/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 04/12/2013
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 04/12/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 04/12/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 04/12/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 04/12/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 04/12/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 04/12/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 04/12/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/12/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 04/12/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 04/12/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 04/12/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 04/12/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/12/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 04/12/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/12/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 04/12/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 04/12/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 04/12/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/12/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/12/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 04/12/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 04/12/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 04/12/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 04/12/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 04/12/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 04/12/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 04/12/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 04/12/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 04/12/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/12/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 04/12/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 04/15/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 04/15/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 04/15/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 04/15/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 04/15/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 04/15/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/15/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/15/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/15/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/15/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 04/15/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/15/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 04/15/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 04/15/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/15/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 04/15/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 04/16/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 06/03/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 06/03/2013