There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Encouraging peace and reunification on the Korean Peninsula.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
08/01/2013Passed/agreed to in Senate: Received in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6257)
07/31/2013Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5254)
06/25/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber All Actions
08/02/2013SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/01/2013SenateReceived in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6257)
07/31/2013-8:26pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/31/2013-8:26pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5254)
07/31/2013-8:08pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 41.
07/31/2013-8:08pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5254-5256)
07/31/2013-8:08pmHouseMr. Royce moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution, as amended.
07/09/2013HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Asia and the Pacific.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
06/25/2013HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
06/25/2013HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
06/25/2013HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (51)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 06/27/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/27/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/27/2013
Del. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/09/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 07/09/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 07/10/2013
Del. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/10/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/10/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 07/10/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/11/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/11/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/11/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 07/11/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/11/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 07/16/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 07/16/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 07/16/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 07/16/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 07/16/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 07/16/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 07/16/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/17/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/17/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/17/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/18/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/18/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 07/18/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 07/18/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/18/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 07/22/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/22/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/22/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 07/23/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 07/23/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 07/23/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 07/24/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/30/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 07/30/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/30/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 07/31/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 07/31/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 07/31/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 07/31/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/31/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 07/31/2013
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/31/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 07/31/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 07/31/2013

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Foreign Affairs06/25/2013 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Asia and the Pacific07/09/2013 Referred to
House Armed Services06/25/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.Con.Res.41. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (08/01/2013)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on July 31, 2013. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Recognizes the historical importance of the Korean War, which began on June 25, 1950.

Honors the service and sacrifice of the U.S. Armed Forces and the armed forces of allied countries that have served in Korea since 1950.

Reaffirms the commitment of the United States to its alliance with South Korea.

Calls on North Korea to respect the fundamental human rights of its citizens, dismantle its nuclear weapons program, and end its nuclear and missile proliferation as integral steps toward peace and eventual reunification.