Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 06/27/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/27/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/27/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/09/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 07/09/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 07/10/2013
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/10/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/10/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 07/10/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/11/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/11/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/11/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 07/11/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/11/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 07/16/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 07/16/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 07/16/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 07/16/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 07/16/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 07/16/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 07/16/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/17/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/17/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/17/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/18/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/18/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 07/18/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 07/18/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/18/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 07/22/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/22/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/22/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 07/23/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 07/23/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 07/23/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 07/24/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/30/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 07/30/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/30/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 07/31/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 07/31/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 07/31/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 07/31/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/31/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 07/31/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/31/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 07/31/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 07/31/2013