Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 10/08/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 10/08/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 10/08/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 10/08/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8]* 10/08/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 10/08/2013
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 10/08/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 10/08/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 10/08/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 10/08/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 10/08/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 10/08/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 10/08/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 10/08/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3]* 10/08/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large]* 10/08/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6]* 10/08/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 10/10/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 10/10/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 10/10/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 10/10/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 10/10/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 10/10/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 10/10/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 10/10/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 10/10/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 10/15/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 10/15/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 10/15/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 10/22/2013
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 10/22/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 10/22/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 10/23/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 10/23/2013