Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 10/11/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 10/11/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 10/11/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 10/11/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 10/11/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 10/11/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 10/11/2013
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 10/11/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30]* 10/11/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 10/11/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 10/11/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 10/11/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 10/11/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 10/11/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 10/11/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 10/11/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 10/11/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 10/11/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 10/11/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 10/11/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 10/11/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large]* 10/11/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 10/11/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11]* 10/11/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5]* 10/11/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18]* 10/11/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6]* 10/11/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 10/11/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 10/11/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 10/16/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 10/16/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/16/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/16/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 10/16/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/16/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 10/16/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 10/16/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 10/22/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/22/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 10/22/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 10/23/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 10/29/2013