Summary: H.Con.Res.62 — 113th Congress (2013-2014)All Information (Except Text)

Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (10/30/2013)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Declares that when the House adjourns on the legislative day of Wednesday, October 30, 2013, Thursday, October 31, 2013, or Friday, November 1, 2013, it stand adjourned until 2 p.m. on Tuesday, November 12, 2013.