Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 11/14/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 11/14/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 11/15/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 11/19/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 12/03/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 01/08/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 01/08/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 02/21/2014