Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 11/21/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 12/02/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 12/02/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 12/05/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 01/08/2014
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 01/15/2014