There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Stop Harming Our Kids Resolution of 2013

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of Congress that efforts by mental health practitioners to change an individual's sexual orientation is dangerous and harmful and should be prohibited from being practiced on minors.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
12/04/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
12/06/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
12/04/2013Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/04/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (38)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 12/04/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 12/04/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 12/04/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 12/04/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 12/04/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 12/04/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 12/04/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 12/04/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 12/04/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 12/04/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 12/04/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 12/04/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 12/04/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 12/04/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 12/04/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 12/12/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 12/12/2013
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 03/26/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/26/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/07/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 06/25/2014
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 06/25/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 06/25/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 06/25/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/25/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 07/10/2014
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/10/2014
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/10/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 07/10/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 07/10/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 07/15/2014
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 07/15/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 07/15/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 07/15/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/15/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 07/15/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 07/30/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 07/30/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce12/04/2013 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health12/06/2013 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.69.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Con.Res.69. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (12/04/2013)

Stop Harming Our Kids Resolution of 2013 - Expresses the sense of Congress that sexual orientation change efforts directed at minors are discredited and ineffective, have no legitimate therapeutic purpose, and are dangerous and harmful.

Encourages states to protect minors from efforts that promote or promise to change sexual orientation or gender identity or expression, based on the premise that being lesbian, gay, bisexual, transgender, or gender nonconforming is a mental illness or developmental disorder that can or should be cured.

Defines "sexual orientation change efforts" as any practice by a licensed mental health provider, health care provider, or counselor seeking or purporting to impose change of an individual's sexual orientation or gender identity or expression.

Excludes from such definition counseling that does not seek to change sexual orientation or gender identity or expression if such counseling provides: (1) acceptance, support, and understanding of a person; (2) coping, social support, and identity exploration and development; (3) developmentally appropriate counseling for a person seeking to transition from one gender to another; or (4) sexual orientation- and gender identity-neutral interventions to prevent or address unlawful conduct or unsafe sexual practices.