Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 12/04/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 12/04/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 12/04/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 12/04/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 12/04/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 12/04/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 12/04/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18]* 12/04/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 12/04/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 12/04/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 12/04/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 12/04/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 12/04/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 12/04/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 12/04/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 12/12/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 12/12/2013
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 03/26/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/26/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/07/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 06/25/2014
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 06/25/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 06/25/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 06/25/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/25/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 07/10/2014
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/10/2014
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/10/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 07/10/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 07/10/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 07/15/2014
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 07/15/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 07/15/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 07/15/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/15/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 07/15/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 07/30/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 07/30/2014