Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 01/27/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 01/27/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 01/27/2014
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 01/27/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 01/27/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 01/28/2014
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 01/28/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 02/03/2014
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 02/03/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 02/10/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 02/18/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/04/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 03/24/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/11/2014