Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 02/25/2014
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 02/25/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/25/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 03/04/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 03/04/2014
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 03/04/2014
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 03/04/2014
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/04/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/04/2014
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 03/04/2014
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/04/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/04/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 03/04/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 03/05/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/05/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 03/05/2014
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/05/2014
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 03/05/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 03/05/2014
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 03/05/2014
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 03/06/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 03/06/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 03/10/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 03/10/2014
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 03/10/2014
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/10/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/10/2014
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/10/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 03/10/2014
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 03/10/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 03/11/2014
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 03/11/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 03/12/2014
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 03/12/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/12/2014
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 03/12/2014
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/18/2014
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/18/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 03/18/2014
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 03/18/2014
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 03/18/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/25/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/27/2014
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/27/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/07/2014
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/08/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/08/2014
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/09/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/09/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 04/10/2014
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/10/2014
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 04/10/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 04/10/2014
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/10/2014
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/10/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 04/10/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 04/10/2014
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/28/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 04/28/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/28/2014
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 04/28/2014
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 05/01/2014
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 05/01/2014
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 05/01/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/20/2014
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 05/20/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/14/2014