Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 03/06/2014
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/12/2014
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/12/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 03/12/2014
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 03/12/2014
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/12/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 03/12/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 03/12/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/13/2014
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 03/13/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 03/13/2014
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/24/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 03/24/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/24/2014
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 04/01/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 04/01/2014
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 04/01/2014
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 04/01/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 11/12/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/12/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/12/2014
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 11/12/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 11/12/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/12/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 11/19/2014
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 11/19/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 11/19/2014
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 11/19/2014
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 11/19/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/19/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 11/19/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/19/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 11/19/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 12/01/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 12/01/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 12/01/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 12/01/2014
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 12/10/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 12/11/2014