Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 03/25/2014
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/27/2014
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/27/2014
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 03/27/2014
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/01/2014
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/01/2014
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 04/08/2014
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 04/08/2014
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 04/08/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 04/28/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew