Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/27/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/27/2014
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/27/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 04/02/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 04/29/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/29/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 04/30/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/30/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 05/06/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 07/08/2014
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 07/15/2014
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 07/22/2014
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 07/24/2014
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 07/28/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/08/2014