There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Proposing a balanced budget amendment to the Constitution of the United States.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/03/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
01/25/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/03/2013Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/03/2013Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E4-5)
Action By: House of Representatives
01/03/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (91)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5]* 01/03/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Rodgers, Cathy McMorris [R-WA-5]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 01/03/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 01/15/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 01/15/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 01/15/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 01/15/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 01/15/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 01/15/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 01/15/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 01/15/2013
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 01/15/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 01/15/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 02/25/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 02/25/2013
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 02/25/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 02/25/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 02/25/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/25/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 02/25/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 02/25/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 02/25/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 02/25/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 02/25/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 02/25/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/25/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 02/25/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/25/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 02/25/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 02/25/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 02/25/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 02/25/2013
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 02/25/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 02/25/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 02/25/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 03/04/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 03/15/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 03/15/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 06/11/2013
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1] 06/11/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 07/09/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/09/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/09/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 07/30/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/30/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 08/02/2013

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/03/2013 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution and Civil Justice01/25/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.J.Res.1. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/03/2013)

Constitutional Amendment - Prohibits total outlays for a fiscal year (except those for repayment of debt principal) from exceeding total receipts for that fiscal year (except those derived from borrowing) unless Congress, by a three-fifths rollcall vote of each chamber, authorizes a specific excess of outlays over receipts.

Limits total outlays for any fiscal year to one-fifth of the U.S. economic output, unless two-thirds of each house of Congress provides for a specific increase above this amount.

Requires a three-fifths rollcall vote of each chamber to increase the limit on U.S. debt held by the public.

Directs the President to submit a balanced budget to Congress annually.

Prohibits any bill to increase revenue from becoming law unless approved by three-fifths of each chamber by rollcall vote.

Authorizes waivers of these requirements and prohibitions when a declaration of war is in effect or under other specified circumstances involving military conflict. Requires any such waiver to identify and be limited to the specific excess or increase for that fiscal year made necessary by the identified military conflict.