Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4]* 11/15/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6]* 11/15/2013
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 11/21/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 11/21/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 11/21/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 11/21/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 11/21/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 11/21/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 12/04/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 03/11/2014
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 05/06/2014