There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Conferring honorary citizenship of the United States on Bernardo de Gálvez y Madrid, Viscount of Galveston and Count of Gálvez.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
12/16/2014Became Public Law No: 113-229. (TXT | PDF)
12/16/2014Signed by President.
12/10/2014Presented to President.
12/04/2014Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6356)
07/28/2014Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6874)
07/22/2014Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 113-548.
01/09/2014Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
12/16/2014Became Public Law No: 113-229. (TXT | PDF)
12/16/2014Signed by President.
12/10/2014HousePresented to President.
12/08/2014SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/04/2014SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6356)
07/29/2014SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
07/28/2014-3:15pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/28/2014-3:15pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6874)
07/28/2014-3:06pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.J. Res. 105.
07/28/2014-3:06pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6874-6875)
07/28/2014-3:06pmHouseMr. Franks (AZ) moved to suspend the rules and pass the resolution.
07/22/2014HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 126.
07/22/2014HouseReported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 113-548.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/10/2014HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/10/2014HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/20/2014HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/09/2014HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
01/09/2014HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/09/2014 Referred to
07/10/2014 Markup by
07/22/2014 Reported by
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security03/20/2014 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.J.Res.105. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 113-229 (12/16/2014)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Confers honorary U.S. citizenship on Bernardo de Galvez y Madrid, Viscount of Galveston and Count of Galvez.