Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 02/04/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 02/04/2014
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 02/04/2014
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 02/06/2014
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 02/06/2014
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/06/2014
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 02/25/2014
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 07/09/2014
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7] 12/12/2014