Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 01/14/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 01/14/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 01/14/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 01/14/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 01/18/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 02/01/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 02/01/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 02/14/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 03/12/2013