Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/14/2014
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 02/14/2014
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 02/14/2014
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 03/04/2014
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 03/12/2014
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 04/07/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 04/07/2014
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 04/07/2014
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 04/07/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 04/07/2014
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 04/07/2014
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 04/29/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 04/29/2014
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 04/29/2014