Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 01/22/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 02/04/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/04/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 02/06/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 02/15/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/26/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 02/27/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 02/27/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/13/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/19/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 04/11/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 05/20/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 07/17/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 08/01/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 10/16/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 12/12/2013
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 02/05/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 04/07/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 04/29/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 05/01/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/01/2014
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 05/06/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 05/08/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 05/19/2014
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 05/29/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/09/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 06/18/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/24/2014
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 07/09/2014