There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the United States to clarify the authority of Congress and the States to regulate corporations, limited liability companies or other corporate entities established by the laws of any State, the United States, or any foreign state.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/22/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
02/28/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/22/2013Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/22/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (36)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 01/22/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 01/23/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 02/04/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/04/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 02/06/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 02/15/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 02/15/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 02/15/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 02/25/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/26/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/13/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/13/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 03/14/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/19/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/19/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 04/11/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 05/20/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/09/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 09/09/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 09/20/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/25/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/25/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 10/30/2013
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 02/05/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 02/05/2014
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 02/10/2014
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 05/06/2014
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 05/19/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/09/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/22/2013 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution and Civil Justice02/28/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.J.Res.21. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/22/2013)

Constitutional Amendment - Declares that: (1) the rights protected by the Constitution are intended to be the rights of natural persons; and (2) the words "people," "person," or "citizen" as used in the Constitution do not include corporations, limited liability companies, or other corporate entities established by the laws of any state, the United States, or any foreign state, and that such corporate entities are subject to such regulation as the people, through their elected state and federal representatives, deem reasonable and are otherwise consistent with the powers of Congress and the states.

Prohibits this Amendment from limiting the rights of freedom of speech, the press, exercise of religion, association, and all such other unalienable rights of the people.