Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 01/22/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 01/23/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 02/04/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/04/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 02/06/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 02/15/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 02/15/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 02/15/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 02/25/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/26/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/13/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/13/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 03/14/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/19/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/19/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 04/11/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 05/20/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/09/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 09/09/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 09/20/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/25/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/25/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 10/30/2013
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 02/05/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 02/05/2014
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 02/10/2014
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 05/06/2014
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 05/19/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/09/2014