Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 02/06/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/06/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 02/06/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/12/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 02/12/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 02/12/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 02/12/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 02/13/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 02/14/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 02/14/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/26/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/26/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 03/05/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/05/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 03/14/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 03/14/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 03/14/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/15/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 07/11/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 07/11/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 12/11/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/03/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 02/03/2014
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 03/04/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 04/07/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 04/07/2014
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 05/06/2014