Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 02/12/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 02/13/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 02/14/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 02/26/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 03/13/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 05/07/2013
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1] 03/26/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 11/18/2014