Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/25/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 02/25/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 03/06/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 03/06/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 03/12/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 03/13/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 03/14/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 03/14/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/14/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 03/14/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 03/20/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 04/16/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 04/16/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 04/24/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 04/26/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 04/26/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/06/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/06/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 06/06/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 06/06/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 06/06/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/06/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 06/06/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/06/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 06/06/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 06/06/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/06/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 06/06/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 06/06/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 06/06/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 06/06/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 06/06/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 07/08/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/09/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 10/23/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 10/23/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 10/23/2013