There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the United States to restore the rights of the American people that were taken away by the Supreme Court's decision in the Citizens United case and related decisions, to protect the integrity of our elections, and to limit the corrosive influence of money in our democratic process.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/12/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
04/08/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/12/2013Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/12/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (75)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 03/12/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 03/12/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 03/13/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/13/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/21/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 04/23/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 04/23/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/14/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/14/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/12/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/18/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 06/28/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 07/18/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/19/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 07/19/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 07/19/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 07/24/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/30/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/30/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 07/30/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 07/31/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 08/01/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 09/16/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 09/16/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 09/16/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/18/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/19/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 09/20/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/23/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 09/23/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 09/26/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 10/04/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 10/04/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 10/28/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 12/03/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 12/05/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 01/28/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/12/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 04/04/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 04/07/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 04/08/2014
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 04/30/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 05/07/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 05/19/2014
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/11/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary03/12/2013 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution and Civil Justice04/08/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.J.Res.34. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/12/2013)

Constitutional Amendment - Declares that, whereas the right to vote in public elections belongs only to natural persons as U.S. citizens, so shall the ability to make contributions and expenditures to influence the outcome of public elections belong only to natural persons.

Declares that nothing in this Constitution shall be construed to restrict the power of Congress and the states to protect the integrity and fairness of the electoral process, limit the corrupting influence of private wealth in public elections, and guarantee the dependence of elected officials on the people alone by taking certainactions.

Includes among such actions: (1) the establishment of systems of public financing for elections; (2) the imposition of requirements to ensure the disclosure of contributions and expenditures made to influence the outcome of a public election by candidates, individuals, and associations of individuals; and (3) the imposition of content neutral limitations on all such contributions and expenditures.

Declares that nothing in this Article shall be construed to alter freedom of the press.

Grants Congress and the states power to enforce this Amendment through appropriate legislation.