Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 03/12/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 03/12/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 03/13/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/13/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/21/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 04/23/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 04/23/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/14/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/14/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/12/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/18/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 06/28/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 07/18/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/19/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 07/19/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 07/19/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 07/24/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/30/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/30/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 07/30/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 07/31/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 08/01/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 09/16/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 09/16/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 09/16/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/18/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/19/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 09/20/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/23/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 09/23/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 09/26/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 10/04/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 10/04/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 10/28/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 12/03/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 12/05/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 01/28/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/12/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 04/04/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 04/07/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 04/08/2014
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 04/30/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 05/07/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 05/19/2014
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/11/2014