Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/03/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 07/11/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/31/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/21/2014