Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7]* 04/23/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9]* 04/23/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 04/25/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 06/05/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 07/30/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 09/11/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 02/06/2014
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1] 04/29/2014
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 04/30/2014
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 05/19/2014
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 05/19/2014
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 06/17/2014
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 06/26/2014
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/14/2014