Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 05/09/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/03/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 06/03/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/03/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/03/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 06/03/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/03/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 06/03/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/03/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/03/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 06/03/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/03/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 06/03/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/03/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 06/03/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 06/11/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 06/11/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 06/11/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 06/11/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 06/11/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/11/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 06/11/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 06/11/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/11/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/11/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 06/11/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 06/11/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 06/11/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/11/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 06/11/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/11/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 06/11/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/11/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/11/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/20/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 06/20/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 06/20/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 06/20/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/20/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 06/20/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/20/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 07/08/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 07/08/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 07/08/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/08/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/08/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 07/08/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/19/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/19/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 07/19/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/19/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 07/30/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/30/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 08/02/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 09/18/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 09/18/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 09/30/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 10/07/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 10/23/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/23/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 11/14/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 11/14/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 11/14/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 11/14/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 11/14/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 11/14/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/20/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 11/20/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 11/20/2013
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 11/20/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 12/04/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 12/04/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 12/12/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 03/24/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew