Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/03/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 06/03/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/03/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 06/11/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 06/11/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 06/11/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 06/11/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 06/11/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/20/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 06/20/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 07/08/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 08/02/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 10/07/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 11/14/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 11/14/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 11/14/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 11/14/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 11/20/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 11/20/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 12/04/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 12/12/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 03/24/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew