Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 06/11/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 06/11/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 06/20/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 07/08/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 07/08/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 07/30/2013

Show cosponsors who withdrew