Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 05/09/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 06/11/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/08/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 07/08/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 09/18/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/23/2013

Show cosponsors who withdrew