Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 05/22/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 05/23/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/23/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/03/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 06/03/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/03/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 06/03/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/03/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 06/05/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/18/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 06/18/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 06/25/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 06/25/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 06/27/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/27/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/10/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 07/16/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 09/10/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 09/10/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 09/12/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 09/12/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 09/17/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 09/17/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 12/04/2013
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 02/04/2014
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/25/2014
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 03/25/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/28/2014
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/28/2014
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 09/09/2014
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 09/11/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 11/12/2014