There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the United States relating to parental rights.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/18/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
07/15/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/18/2013Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
06/18/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (80)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 06/18/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/16/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 07/16/2013
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 07/16/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 07/16/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 07/16/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 07/16/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 07/16/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/16/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/16/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 07/16/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/16/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/16/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 07/16/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/16/2013
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 08/01/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 08/01/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 08/01/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 08/01/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 08/01/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 10/15/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 10/15/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 10/15/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 12/19/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 12/19/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 12/19/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 12/19/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 12/19/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 03/11/2014
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 03/14/2014
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 04/10/2014
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 04/28/2014
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 05/13/2014
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 05/20/2014
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/09/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 06/17/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 06/17/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 09/08/2014
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 09/15/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary06/18/2013 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution and Civil Justice07/15/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.J.Res.50. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/18/2013)

Constitutional Amendment - States that the liberty of parents to direct the upbringing, education, and care of their children is a fundamental right.

Declares further that the parental right to direct education includes the right to choose public, private, religious, or home schools, and the right to make reasonable choices within public schools for one's child.

States that neither the United States nor any state shall infringe upon this right without demonstrating that its governmental interest, as applied to the person, is of the highest order and not otherwise served.

Prohibits this article from being construed to apply to a parental action or decision that would end life.

Declares that no treaty may be adopted nor shall any source of international law be employed to supersede, modify, interpret, or apply to the rights guaranteed by this amendment.