Refine your search

Refined by:

Pennsylvania Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 03/14/2014
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 04/28/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 06/17/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 09/08/2014