Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 06/18/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 06/18/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/16/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 07/16/2013
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 07/16/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 07/16/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 07/16/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 07/16/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 07/16/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/16/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/16/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 07/16/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/16/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/16/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 07/16/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/16/2013
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 08/01/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 08/01/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 08/01/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 08/01/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 08/01/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 10/15/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 10/15/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 10/15/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 12/19/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 12/19/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 12/19/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 12/19/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 12/19/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 03/11/2014
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 03/14/2014
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 04/10/2014
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 04/28/2014
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 05/13/2014
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 05/20/2014
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/09/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 06/17/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 06/17/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 09/08/2014
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 09/15/2014